AL HB147 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 919
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 919
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Supplemental appropriations from the Education Trust Fund Advancement and Technology Fund to various school systems and colleges and universities, and other entities for fiscal year ending September 30, 2024.
Title
Supplemental appropriations from the Education Trust Fund Advancement and Technology Fund to various school systems and colleges and universities, and other entities for fiscal year ending September 30, 2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 919 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt - Roll Call 918 GKA3C62-1 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 587 1MR2Z3L-1 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt - Roll Call 918 GKA3C62-1 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 587 1MR2Z3L-1 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 919 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 918 GKA3C62-1 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Orr 2nd Substitute Offered GKA3C62-1 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Orr motion to Table - Adopted Voice Vote NWGWT8T-1 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education 1st Substitute Offered NWGWT8T-1 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading in Second House |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education 1st Substitute NWGWT8T-1 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Pending Senate Finance and Taxation Education |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
2024-04-16 | House | Engrossed |
2024-04-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 588 |
2024-04-16 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 587 1MR2Z3L-1 |
2024-04-16 | House | Ways and Means Education 1st Substitute Offered 1MR2Z3L-1 |
2024-04-16 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-09 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-09 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-04-09 | House | Ways and Means Education 1st Substitute 1MR2Z3L-1 |
2024-02-07 | House | Pending House Ways and Means Education |
2024-02-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means Education |