AL HB287 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-03 - Delivered to Governor at 5:05 p.m. on May 3, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-03 - Delivered to Governor at 5:05 p.m. on May 3, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Monroe Co., sheriff, service of process, fee, distrib. to county commission for law enforcement purposes
Title
Monroe Co., sheriff, service of process, fee, distrib. to county commission for law enforcement purposes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 33 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 33 Abs: 31) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-03 | Delivered to Governor at 5:05 p.m. on May 3, 2011 | |
2011-05-03 | Assigned Act No. 2011-243. | |
2011-05-03 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2011-05-03 | Signature Requested | |
2011-05-03 | Enrolled | |
2011-05-03 | Passed Second House | |
2011-05-03 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 478 | |
2011-05-03 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-27 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-03-31 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2011-03-29 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 83 | |
2011-03-29 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-24 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-03-22 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |