AL HB287 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-03 - Forwarded to Governor at 11:25 a.m. on March 3, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-03 - Forwarded to Governor at 11:25 a.m. on March 3, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Emergency medical transport providers, assessment imposed for the maintenance and expansion of emergency medical transport services through additional Medicaid enhancement payments, methodology for calculation of assessment and rate provided, and effective period for assessment provided, Secs 40-26B-90 to 40-26B-99, inclusive, added.
Title
Emergency medical transport providers, assessment imposed for the maintenance and expansion of emergency medical transport services through additional Medicaid enhancement payments, methodology for calculation of assessment and rate provided, and effective period for assessment provided, Secs 40-26B-90 to 40-26B-99, inclusive, added.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 470 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - SBIR: Albritton motion to Adopt Roll Call 469 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 269 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - HBIR: Clouse motion to Adopt Roll Call 268 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - SBIR: Albritton motion to Adopt Roll Call 469 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 269 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - HBIR: Clouse motion to Adopt Roll Call 268 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | House | Forwarded to Governor at 11:25 a.m. on March 3, 2022. |
2022-03-03 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-128. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-03-03 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-03-03 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-03 | House | Passed Second House |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 470 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2022-02-17 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 269 |
2022-02-17 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-08 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 26B | 90 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 26B | 91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 26B | 92 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 26B | 93 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 26B | 94 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 26B | 95 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 26B | 96 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 26B | 97 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 26B | 98 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 26B | 99 | New Code | See Bill Text |