AL HB454 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 2:02 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 2:02 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Probation and parole, supervision fee raised, requirement that employer submit by fifth of month eliminated, Sec. 15-22-2 am'd
Title
Probation and parole, supervision fee raised, requirement that employer submit by fifth of month eliminated, Sec. 15-22-2 am'd
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Wood [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-16 - House - Wood motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2012-05-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-11 - Senate - Williams motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 74 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2012-05-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-11 - Senate - Williams motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 74 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 26) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | Delivered to Governor at 2:02 p. m. on May 16, 2012. | |
2012-05-16 | Assigned Act No. 2012-522. | |
2012-05-16 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-16 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-16 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-16 | Concurred in Second House Amendment | |
2012-05-16 | Wood motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1537 | |
2012-05-16 | Concurrence Requested | |
2012-05-10 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1342 | |
2012-05-10 | Williams motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1341 | |
2012-05-10 | Williams Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-10 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-08 | Williams Carry Over to the Call of the Chair Granted | |
2012-05-08 | Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Judiciary | |
2012-05-03 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-17 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary | |
2012-04-12 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 749 | |
2012-04-12 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-22 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-03-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |