TN SB2253 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 17 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 17 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends, from three business days to five business days, the time in which a provider must send a claimant's medical records to a requesting party after receipt of payment for the records. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 26.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 29, Chapter 26, relative to healthcare liability actions.
Sponsors
Sen. John Stevens [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 72 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 5, Nays 1 PNV 2 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 5, Nays 1 PNV 2 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-16 | House | Passed H., Ayes 72, Nays 19, PNV 3 |
2024-04-16 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0982) |
2024-04-16 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-04-15 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 24, Nays 5 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0949) |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/11/2024 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/11/2024 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/10/2024 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 5, Nays 1 PNV 2 |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/2/2024 |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/1/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2001 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-16 - Comp. SB subst.