AL HB612 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-26 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1
Pending: Senate Local Legislation No. 1 Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-26 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1
Pending: Senate Local Legislation No. 1 Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Cleburne Co., court costs in traffic cases, county commission authorized to levy additional in circuit, district, or municipal court, distrib.
Title
Cleburne Co., court costs in traffic cases, county commission authorized to levy additional in circuit, district, or municipal court, distrib.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 36 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-26 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2011-05-25 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 863 | |
2011-05-25 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-24 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-05 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |