AL HJR18 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Forwarded to Governor on March 12, 2020 at 11:57 a.m. on March 12, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Forwarded to Governor on March 12, 2020 at 11:57 a.m. on March 12, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution, Local Constitutional Amendment application, Calhoun Co., election to authorize operation of bingo games for prizes or money
Title
Resolution, Local Constitutional Amendment application, Calhoun Co., election to authorize operation of bingo games for prizes or money
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Wood [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Forwarded to Governor on March 12, 2020 at 11:57 a.m. on March 12, 2020. |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned Act No. 2020-88. |
2020-03-12 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2020-03-12 | House | Passed Second House |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2020-02-25 | House | Jones (M) motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2020-02-25 | House | Reported from Rules |
2020-02-06 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |