AR HB1171 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Notification that HB1171 is now Act 1206
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Notification that HB1171 is now Act 1206
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Statutes Concerning The Local Police And Fire Pension And Relief Funds.
Title
To Amend The Statutes Concerning The Local Police And Fire Pension And Relief Funds.
Sponsors
Rep. Allen Kerr [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-10 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-12 | House | Notification that HB1171 is now Act 1206 |
2013-04-11 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-04-10 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-04-10 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-04-02 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-01 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-26 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-26 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-26 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-01-28 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT |
2013-01-28 | House | Filed |