AR HB1534 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Clarify The Procedures For Obtaining Or Transferring A Permit For A Private Club.
Title
To Clarify The Procedures For Obtaining Or Transferring A Permit For A Private Club.
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Slape [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 30 N: 39 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-11 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 45 N: 37 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 45 N: 37 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment |
2019-03-12 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2019-03-11 | House | The vote by which HB1534 Failed to Pass was expunged. |
2019-03-11 | House | Motion by Representative Wardlaw to expunge vote on HB1534 passed |
2019-03-11 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2019-03-07 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-07 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-07 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-06 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2019-02-20 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2019-02-20 | House | Filed |