AR SB2 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly 1st Special
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Notification that SB2 is now Act 3
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Notification that SB2 is now Act 3
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Arkansas Law Concerning Certain Engrossment Errors Arising From The 2015 Regular Session Of The Ninetieth General Assembly; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Amend Arkansas Law Concerning Certain Engrossment Errors Arising From The 2015 Regular Session Of The Ninetieth General Assembly; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Standridge [R] | Rep. John Vines [D] | Sen. Eddie Cheatham [D] | Sen. Eddie Williams [R] |
Sen. Missy Irvin [R] | Sen. Jonathan Dismang [R] | Sen. Jeremy Hutchinson [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-29 | Senate | Notification that SB2 is now Act 3 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2015-05-28 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2015-05-28 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2015-05-28 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-05-27 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-05-27 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE MANAGEMENT |
2015-05-27 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology, and Legislative Affairs |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Filed |