AR SB2 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly 1st Special
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Notification that SB2 is now Act 8
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Notification that SB2 is now Act 8
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Integrate And Incorporate The Provisions Of Acts Of 2017 Into Arkansas Constitution, Amendment 98, Also Known As The "arkansas Medical Marijuana Amendment Of 2016"; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Integrate And Incorporate The Provisions Of Acts Of 2017 Into Arkansas Constitution, Amendment 98, Also Known As The "arkansas Medical Marijuana Amendment Of 2016"; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Notification that SB2 is now Act 8 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2017-05-03 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2017-05-03 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-05-03 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-05-02 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-05-02 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2017-05-02 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Filed |