AZ HB2446 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - Transmit to House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - Transmit to House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
State agencies; continuation; appropriation
Title
State agencies; continuation; appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Energy and Military Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Energy and Military Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (18-12-0-0) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate CEM Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (4-0-3-0) |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Senate CEM Committee |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate CEM Committee |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-03-05 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-03-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (43-12-5-0) |
2014-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-02-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-18 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2014-01-28 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-12 | House | House COM Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2014-01-29 | House | Referred to House COM Committee |
2014-01-29 | House | House read second time |
2014-01-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-01-28 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2014-01-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |