AZ HB2531 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Courtordered evaluation services; payment
Title
Courtordered evaluation services; payment
Sponsors
Sen. Kate Brophy McGee [R] | Sen. Carlyle Begay [R] | Sen. John McComish [R] | Sen. Lynne Pancrazi [D] |
Rep. Justin Pierce [R] | Sen. Michele Reagan [R] | Sen. Bob Worsley [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-0-3-0) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate HHS Committee |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-03-07 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-03-06 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2014-03-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-03-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-03 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2014-01-30 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-19 | House | House HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to House HEALTH Committee |
2014-02-03 | House | House read second time |
2014-01-30 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-01-30 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2014-01-30 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |