AZ SB1015 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - House read second time
Pending: House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - House read second time
Pending: House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
National guard special plates; eligibility
Title
National guard special plates; eligibility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation, Technology and Missing Children Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation, Technology and Missing Children Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | House | House read second time |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to House TI Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-03-05 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (22-6-2-0) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Senate TTMC Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-0) |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TTMC Committee |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2023-12-19 | Senate | Prefile |