AZ SB1140 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Chapter 331
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Chapter 331
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Certificates of authority; video service
Title
Certificates of authority; video service
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-30 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House Land, Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House Land, Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | Senate | Chapter 331 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-04-30 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (36-20-4-0) |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (22-7-1-0) |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Conference adopted |
2018-04-25 | House | House Conference adopted |
2018-04-24 | House | House Conference caucus date |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conference caucus date |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conference report: That the Senate accept the House amendments with exceptions and the bill be further amended. |
2018-04-19 | House | House Minority report |
2018-04-18 | House | House Conference members: NORGAARD, ESPINOZA, GRANTHAM |
2018-04-18 | House | House Conference appointed |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conference members: FANN, GRIFFIN, MENDEZ |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conference appointed |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate minority caucus |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-04-11 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-27-2-0) |
2018-04-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-04-10 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-04-10 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-04-09 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-2-0-1-0-0) |
2018-03-28 | House | House APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-4-0-0-0-0) |
2018-03-26 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2018-03-26 | House | House LARA Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2018-02-20 | House | House read second time |
2018-02-19 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-02-19 | House | Assigned to House LARA Committee |
2018-02-19 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2018-02-13 | House | Transmit to House |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-1-0-0) |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 1092.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3018.05 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3026.05 | New Code | See Bill Text |