AZ SCR1011 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - House read second time
Pending: House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - House read second time
Pending: House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Voting; qualifications; methods.
Title
Voting; qualifications; methods.
Sponsors
Sen. Wendy Rogers [R] | Sen. David Farnsworth [R] | Sen. John Kavanagh [R] | Sen. Anthony Kern [R] |
Sen. Justine Wadsack [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to House MOE Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-02-27 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate ELEC Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ELEC Committee |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Concurrent Resolution
Constitution Of Arizona
Constitutional Amendments (arizona)
Method Of Voting
Methods
Proposing An Amendment To The Constitution Of Arizona
Qualifications
Qualifications For Voting
Secrecy
Suffrage And Elections
Voting
Constitution Of Arizona
Constitutional Amendments (arizona)
Method Of Voting
Methods
Proposing An Amendment To The Constitution Of Arizona
Qualifications
Qualifications For Voting
Secrecy
Suffrage And Elections
Voting