CA AB106 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1040 of the Evidence Code, to amend Section 17706 of the Family Code, to amend Sections 1522 and 1596.871 of, and to amend, repeal, and add Sections 1534, 1569.33, 1597.09, and 1597.55a of, the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 18726 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, to amend Section 1095 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, and to amend Sections 9305, 11265.3, 11265.47, 11330.5, 11461.3, 11477, 13302, 14124.93, 17600.10, 17600.15, 17601.25, 17604, 17605, 17605.051, 17605.07, 17606.10, 17608.05, 17608.10, 17609.05, 18910, and 18358.30 of, to amend the heading of Chapter 5.6 (commencing with Section 13300) of Part 3 of Division 9 of, to amend and repeal Sections 17603.05 and 17604.05 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 17600 and 17606.20 of, to add Sections 11253.4, 13303, 13304, 13305, 13306, 15753, and 18910.1 to, to repeal Sections 17605.05, 17605.08, 17606.05, 17606.15, and 17608.15 of, and to repeal and add Section 17605.10 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to human services, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Human services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Assembly - AB 106 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By WEBER (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Assembly - AB 106 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By WEBER (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | Died on Senate inactive file. |
2015-09-11 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (June 18). Senate Rule 29 suspended. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 1486.) Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-17 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2015-06-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 637.) |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 611.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 611.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-01-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2015-01-12 | Assembly | Read first time. From printer. May be heard in committee February 11. |
2015-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |