CA AB1085 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 384, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 384, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 39601.5 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to air pollution.
Title
State Air Resources Board: regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-09-08 - Assembly - AB 1085 MENDOZA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1085 Mendoza By Dutton (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1085 MENDOZA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1085 Mendoza By Dutton (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1085 MENDOZA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 384, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2009-09-29 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2009-09-08 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3102.) | |
2009-09-03 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2009-09-02 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2123.) | |
2009-09-01 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-08-31 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2009-08-17 | Ordered to third reading. | |
2009-07-15 | Read second time, amended, and to third reading. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-07-14 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 13). | |
2009-07-06 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-06-29 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-06-23 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 22). | |
2009-06-11 | Referred to Com. on EQ. | |
2009-05-28 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-28 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1767.) | |
2009-05-26 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-05-21 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 20). | |
2009-05-07 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-06 | Read second time and amended. | |
2009-05-05 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 27). | |
2009-04-20 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-04-16 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2009-04-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To print. |