CA AB1152 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 65009 of the Government Code, and to add Section 21167.9.5 to the Public Resources Code, relating to public agencies.
Title
Public agencies: causes of action: local planning and zoning: California Environmental Quality Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2023-04-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2023-04-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2023-04-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65009 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21167.9.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |