CA AB1426 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 946, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 946, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 281 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to communications.
Title
California Advanced Services Fund: Broadband Adoption Account.
Sponsors
Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Asm. Laurie Davies [R] | Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] | Asm. Jim Patterson [R] |
Sen. Susan Rubio [D] | Sen. Kelly Seyarto [R] | Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1426 Mathis Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1426 Mathis et al. By Grove (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-08 - Senate - Special Consent AB1426 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1426 Mathis Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1426 Mathis et al. By Grove (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-08 - Senate - Special Consent AB1426 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1426 Mathis Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 946, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. |
2022-08-15 | Senate | In Senate. Held at Desk. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4685.). |
2022-08-03 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-06-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2021-08-19 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Bates. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1338.) |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 28). |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on C. & C. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 281 | Amended Code | Citation Text |