CA AB1481 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 372, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 372, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 14011.66, 14148.03, 14148.1, 14148.3, 14148.7, and 14148.85 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal: presumptive eligibility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-12 - Assembly - AB 1481 Boerner Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 68 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1481 Boerner et al. By Skinner (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - AB 1481 Boerner Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1481 Boerner et al. By Skinner (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - AB 1481 Boerner Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 372, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-12 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 68. Noes 2. Page 3241.). |
2023-09-12 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3228.) |
2023-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 3. Page 2551.). |
2023-08-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-08-28 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2023-08-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-08-14 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-07-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-07-13 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 12). |
2023-06-12 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 1. Page 1787.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14011.66 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14148.03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14148.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14148.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14148.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14148.85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |