CA AB1553 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 7, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 7, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4827 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Sections 1846 and 1847 of the Civil Code, to amend Section 14503 of the Corporations Code, to amend Sections 17003, 31607, 31621, 31622, 31752.5, 32001, and 32003 of the Food and Agricultural Code, to amend Section 25802 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 121690, 121916, 122045, 122125, and 122322 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 597, 597.1, 597.2, 597e, 597f, 597u, 597v, 599aa, and 599e of the Penal Code, relating to animal impoundment.
Title
Animal impoundment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1553 Fong et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 1553 Fong Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 1553 Fong Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 7, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-06-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1450.). |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 3). |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1473.) |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |