CA AB1620 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 19141, 19141.1, 19243, 19838, 19995.1, 19995.4, 22871.3, 22879, 22944.5, 22958.1, and 68203 of, and to add Sections 19829.9844, 19829.9845, 19829.9846, 20683.3, 22874.4, and 22958.2 to, the Government Code, relating to state employment, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
State employment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Assembly - AB 1620 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Assembly - AB 1620 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | Died on Senate inactive file. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Leno. |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (June 13). |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 4580.) |
2016-04-25 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 4488.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2016-01-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 7. |
2016-01-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 19141 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19141.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19243 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19829.9844 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 19829.9845 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 19829.9846 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 19838 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19995.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19995.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 20683.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 22871.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 22874.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 22879 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 22944.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 22958.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 22958.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 68203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |