CA AB1942 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 66032 to the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.
Title
Public postsecondary education: students: paid opportunities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2024-01-30 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 29. |
2024-01-29 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66032 | New Code | See Bill Text |