CA AB2135 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-26 - In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-26 - In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 18941.11 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to building standards.
Title
Building standards: solar distributed generation
Sponsors
Asm. Luis Alejo [D] | Asm. Robert Blumenfield [D] | Asm. Nathan Fletcher [R] | Asm. Jose Solorio [D] |
Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] | Asm. Das Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-26 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2135 BLUMENFIELD Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2135 BLUMENFIELD Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-26 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |
2012-06-25 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2012-06-20 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-06-11 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2012-05-24 | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and G.O. | |
2012-05-17 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-17 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4889.) | |
2012-05-10 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-05-09 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 9). | |
2012-04-25 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-19 | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2012-04-18 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-04-10 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-03-28 | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2012-03-27 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-03-12 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2012-02-24 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | |
2012-02-23 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 18941.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |