CA AB2266 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 5.6 (commencing with Section 44160) to Part 5 of Division 26 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to air pollution.
Title
California Hybrid and Zero-Emission Truck and Bus Voucher Incentive Project: vehicle eligibility.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and NAT. RES. |
2024-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 44160 | New Code | See Bill Text |