CA AB2466 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 967, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 967, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1521.6 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 15200 and 16518 of, and to add Section 16518.5 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to foster children.
Title
Foster children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-23 - Assembly - AB 2466 Cervantes Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2466 Cervantes By Laird (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Assembly - AB 2466 Cervantes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2466 Cervantes By Laird (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Assembly - AB 2466 Cervantes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 967, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 60. Noes 16.) |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4941.). |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 21). |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 13). |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD. |
2022-05-17 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 4694.) |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 5). |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1521.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 15200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16518 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16518.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |