CA AB2523 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend and repeal Sections 35177 and 72029 of the Education Code, to amend and repeal Sections 10003, 10202, and 10544 of the Elections Code, and to amend Section 85301 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 85305, 85306, 85307, 85315, 85316, 85317, and 85318 of, and to add Section 85702.5 to, the Government Code, relating to elections.
Title
Local elective offices: contribution limitations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2523 Mullin By Allen (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2523 Mullin By Allen (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2523 MULLIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2523 Mullin By Allen (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2523 MULLIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | Died on Senate inactive file. |
2016-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Allen. |
2016-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 5495.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Allen. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5495.) |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11). |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 5195.) |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 5.) (May 27). |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 13). |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 35177 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 72029 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 10003 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 10202 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 10544 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 10800 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 82039.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 85301 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 85301.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 85305 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 85306 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 85307 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 85315 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 85316 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 85317 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 85318 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 85702.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |