CA AB2777 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-02 - Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 23. Noes 34. Page 5252.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-02 - Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 23. Noes 34. Page 5252.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 22.6 (commencing with Section 22620) to Division 8 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to business.
Title
Transportation network company: employment: convictions and arrests.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2777 NAZARIAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [FAIL]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 23. Noes 34. Page 5252.). |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (May 27). |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-05-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4448.) From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 22620 | New Code | See Bill Text |