CA AB2911 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 422, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 422, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 303.5, 2052, 2053, 2155.3, 2157.2, 2223, 2224, 2300, 3007, 3019.5, 3021.5, 3022, 3023, 4101, 9050, 9054, 9067, 9068, 9069, 9081, 9082, 9082.5, 9082.7, 9083, 9083.5, 9084, 9085, 9086, 9087, 9088, 9089, 9090, 9092, 9093, 9094, 9094.5, 9095, 9096, 9160, 9162, 9163, 9280, 9282, 9285, 9286, 9312, 9313, 9314, 9315, 9316, 9402, 9501, 10531, 11324, 11325, 11327, 13118, 13244, 13263, 13300, 13300.5, 13300.7, 13302, 13303, 13305, 13306, 13307, 13307.5, 13312, 13314, 13315, 13316, 13317, 14219, 18301, 18390, 19202, 19321, 19323, and 20009 of, to amend the heading of Article 7 (commencing with Section 9080) of Chapter 1 of Division 9 of, and to amend the heading of Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 13300) of Division 13 of, the Elections Code, relating to voting.
Title
Voting: voter information guides.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2016-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2911 E.& R. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By WEBER (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2911 Committee On E. & R. (Weber) By Allen (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Assembly - AB 2911 E.& R. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2911 Committee On E. & R. (Weber) By Allen (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Assembly - AB 2911 E.& R. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 422, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-07 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2016-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6359.). |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5267.). |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 8). |
2016-05-19 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4690.) |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2016-03-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 15. |
2016-03-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |