CA AB302 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-06 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-06 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1720 of the Labor Code, relating to public works.
Title
Public works: public subsidies.
Sponsors
Asm. Edwin Chau [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-06 - Assembly - AB 302 CHAU Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 55 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB302 Chau By Monning (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Assembly - AB 302 CHAU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB302 Chau By Monning (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Assembly - AB 302 CHAU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2014-01-06 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2013-10-13 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2013-09-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2013-09-06 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 21. Page 2905.). |
2013-09-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 6 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 2095.). |
2013-08-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2013-08-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 26). |
2013-06-17 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 997.) |
2013-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 10). |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2013-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2013-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 1720 | Amended Code | Citation Text |