CA AB646 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 1.3 (commencing with Section 10050) to Part 7 of Division 1 of Title 1 of, and to add and repeal Section 10051 of, the Education Code, relating to public education governance.
Title
Public education governance: regional P-20 councils: advisory committee.
Sponsors
Asm. Ken Cooley [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2014-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. In committee: Held under submission. |
2014-01-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2014-01-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2013-09-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-09-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HIGHER ED. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 10050 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 10051 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |