CA AB773 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 49040 of, and to add Section 49042 to, the Education Code, relating to voter education.
Title
Voter education: high school pupils.
Sponsors
Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] | Asm. Tasha Boerner Horvath [D] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Asm. Todd Gloria [D] |
Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] | Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D] | Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-09 - Assembly - AB 773 Gonzalez Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 66 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB773 Gonzalez et al. By Dod (Y: 5 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB773 Gonzalez et al. By Dodd (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - AB 773 Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 12 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Redistricting] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB773 Gonzalez et al. By Dod (Y: 5 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB773 Gonzalez et al. By Dodd (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - AB 773 Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 12 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Redistricting] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2019-10-07 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 66. Noes 11. Page 3101.). |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 2507.). |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 30). |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and E. & C.A. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 12. Page 2036.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (May 16). |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 10). |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 27). |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ED. and E. & R. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 49040 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 49042 | New Code | See Bill Text |