CA AB913 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 253, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 253, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 850 and 3280 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Electrical corporations: wildfire and undercollection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 913 Calderon Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB913 Calderon (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 913 Limón Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB913 Calderon (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 913 Limón Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 253, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-14 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5493.). |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 31). |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5456.) |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.). |
2020-08-30 | Senate | (Ayes 29. Noes 10.) |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Joint Rule 10.5 suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 10.) |
2020-08-30 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2020-08-27 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Bradford. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1361.) |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 10). |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 3280 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 850 | Amended Code | Citation Text |