CA AB93 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 1, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 1, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to elections, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Elections: City of Bell.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-21 - Assembly - AB 93 LARA Concurrence- Urgency Added (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE AB93 Lara Urgency Clause (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Assembly - AB 93 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [FAIL]
2011-03-21 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE AB93 Lara Urgency Clause (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Assembly - AB 93 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 1, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-03-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-03-21 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 6 p.m. | |
2011-03-21 | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 21). Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 640.). | |
2011-03-17 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after March 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 622.) | |
2011-03-17 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (March 17). Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 378.). | |
2011-03-16 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 350.) | |
2011-03-15 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | |
2011-03-14 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-03-07 | Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-02-22 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-02-22 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 0. Page 414.) | |
2011-02-18 | Without reference to committee. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-01-11 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. | |
2011-01-10 | Read first time. To print. |