CA AB933 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on October 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 670, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on October 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 670, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 47.1 to the Civil Code, relating to privileged communications.
Title
Privileged communications: incident of sexual assault, harassment, or discrimination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-11 - Assembly - AB 933 Aguiar-Curry Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2023-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB933 Aguiar-Curry et al. By Rubio (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Assembly - AB 933 Aguiar-Curry Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB933 Aguiar-Curry et al. By Rubio (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Assembly - AB 933 Aguiar-Curry Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 670, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 0. Page 3196.). |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3011.) |
2023-09-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2023-09-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 2388.). |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 13). |
2023-05-25 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 2. Page 1264.) |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-03-22 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2023-03-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 21). |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2023-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 47.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |