CA AR35 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-24-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-14 - Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 3909.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-14 - Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 3909.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Women's History Month.
Title
Relative to Women's History Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-14 | Assembly | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 3909.). |
2016-02-29 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (February 29). |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-02-01 | Assembly | Introduced. |