CA AR38 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-20-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-17 - Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 3977.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-17 - Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 3977.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Season for Nonviolence.
Title
Relative to Season for Nonviolence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-17 | Assembly | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 3977.). |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 3). |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-02-16 | Assembly | Introduced. |