CA AR42 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-18-1)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-31 - Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 4120.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-31 - Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 4120.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to César Chávez.
Title
Relative to César Chávez.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-28 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | Assembly | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 4120.). |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 28). |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-03-10 | Assembly | Introduced. |