CA AR49 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-25-1)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-02 - Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 4615.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-02 - Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 4615.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Cinco de Mayo Week.
Title
Relative to Cinco de Mayo Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-25 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Assembly | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 4615.). |
2016-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 25). |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | Introduced. |