CA AR54 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-7-1)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-27 - Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 5512.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-27 - Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 5512.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Lesbian, Gay, Bisexual, and Transgender (LGBT) Pride Month.
Title
Relative to Lesbian, Gay, Bisexual, and Transgender (LGBT) Pride Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-16 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-27 | Assembly | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 5512.). |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 16). |
2016-06-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | Introduced. |