CA SB1161 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 318, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 318, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 99177 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Transit operators: street harassment survey.
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Min [D] | Asm. Matt Haney [D] | Sen. Susan Rubio [D] | Asm. Miguel Santiago [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1161 Min et al. Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1161 Min Senate Third Reading By Mike Fong (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB1161 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1161 Min Senate Third Reading By Mike Fong (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB1161 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 318, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5271.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (August 11). |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3934.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3786.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 3441.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | March 22 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing March 22. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and JUD. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 99177 | New Code | See Bill Text |