CA SB1239 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on the inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on the inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 44011 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to vehicular air pollution.
Title
Smog check: exemptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1239 Gaines Reconsider (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1239 Gaines (Y: 18 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1239 Gaines (Y: 18 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | Died on the inactive file. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Monning. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 18. Noes 18. Page 4112.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Gaines. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4112.) |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4007.) (May 27). |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | May 2 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 5. Page 3616.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | April 12 hearing: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 12. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 44011 | Amended Code | Citation Text |