CA SB1422 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 156, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 156, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 799 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to public utilities.
Title
Public utilities and other service suppliers: collection of local taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-04 - Assembly - SB 1422 Glazer Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Utilities and Commerce to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1422 Glazer (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Utilities and Commerce to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1422 Glazer (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 156, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-08-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2016-08-04 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5721.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2016-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and U. & C. |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3775.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3699.) (April 27). |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 727.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 799 | Amended Code | Citation Text |