CA SB1422 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 310, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 310, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 10298.5 of the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Acquisition of goods and services: alternative contracting procedures: installation of carpet, resilient flooring, synthetic turf, and lighting fixtures: pilot.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1422 Hertzberg Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1422 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By Santiago (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1422 Hertzberg (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1422 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By Santiago (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1422 Hertzberg (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 310, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5078.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-18 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 5940.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (August 11). |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-21 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 3876.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3796.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3512.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3377.) (April 7). |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Set for hearing April 7. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and G.O. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 10298.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |