CA SB292 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 31000.6 of the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Counties: contract legal counsel: auditor-controller.
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Asm. William Brough [R] | Asm. Tom Daly [D] | Sen. Tony Mendoza [D] |
Sen. Janet Nguyen [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # SB292 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # SB292 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-01 | Assembly | September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2017-08-23 | Assembly | August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1355.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1181.) (May 25). |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 852.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 538.) (March 29). |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | March 22 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing March 22. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and PUB. S. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 24054 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 26881.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 29611 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 31000.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 424 | Amended Code | Citation Text |