CA SB325 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-09 - July 9 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-09 - July 9 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 9.7 (commencing with Section 4450) to Division 2 of the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Sections 11830, 11830.1, 11830.5, 11831, 11831.2, 11831.5, 11831.6, 11831.7, 11832, 11832.1, and 11833 of, to amend the heading of Chapter 7 (commencing with Section 11830) of Part 2 of Division 10.5 of, to amend and renumber Section 11830.01 of, and to add Section 11831.51 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.
Title
Substance abuse recovery or treatment providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB325 Hill (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB325 Hill (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | Assembly | July 9 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1267.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1096.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 715.) (April 10). |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4450 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11830 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11830.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11830.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11831 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11831.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11831.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11831.51 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11831.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11831.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11832 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11832.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11833 | Amended Code | Citation Text |