CA SB58 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-02 - Referred to Com. on U. & C.
Pending: Assembly Utilities and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-02 - Referred to Com. on U. & C.
Pending: Assembly Utilities and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 379.7 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Antelope Valley Fairgrounds EE and PV Synergy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-23 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB58 Runner (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Referred to Com. on U. & C. | |
2011-05-23 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-05-23 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1062.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-18 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-05-17 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-05-06 | Set for hearing May 16. | |
2011-05-04 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 857.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-12 | Set for hearing May 3. | |
2011-04-11 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-04-08 | Set for hearing April 28. | |
2011-03-31 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | |
2011-03-24 | Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-01-03 | Read first time. | |
2010-12-22 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 21. | |
2010-12-21 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 379.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |