CA SB636 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 605, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 605, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 10752.5 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to vehicle license fees.
Title
Vehicle license fees.
Sponsors
Sen. Roy Ashburn [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-08-20 - Assembly - SB 636 Ashburn Senate Third Reading By LOGUE (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Revenue and Taxation to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Senate - Special Consent #4 SB636 Ashburn (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Revenue and Taxation to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Senate - Special Consent #4 SB636 Ashburn (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 605, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by Governor. | |
2009-09-10 | Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m. | |
2009-09-08 | Returned by the Governor at the request of the Senate. Ordered held in Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2009-08-27 | Enrolled. To Governor at 10 a.m. | |
2009-08-24 | In Senate. To enrollment. (Enrolled measure version corrected August 25.) | |
2009-08-20 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2677.) To Senate. | |
2009-07-01 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-06-30 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file. | |
2009-06-17 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Heard in committee on June 17.) | |
2009-06-02 | To Coms. on L. GOV. and REV. & TAX. | |
2009-05-14 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-05-14 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 901.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-11 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-05-07 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-06 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file. | |
2009-04-30 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-04-29 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 703.) | |
2009-04-21 | Set for hearing April 29. | |
2009-04-16 | Re-referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and RLS. | |
2009-04-13 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-03-19 | To Com. on RLS. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-02-28 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |