CA SB784 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2401 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Health care districts: employment.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Becker [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | January 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Set for hearing January 18. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | January 16 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Set for hearing January 16. |
2023-05-15 | Senate | May 15 hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | May 8 hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 941.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 747.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26 in HEALTH pending receipt. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E. D. and HEALTH. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2401 | Amended Code | Citation Text |